House | 05/20/2019 | File Number 940 | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 534 | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8750 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | File Number 151 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | House Calendar Number 115 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |