House | 05/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | File Number 291 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | House Calendar Number 199 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |