Senate | 06/05/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 690 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | File Number 152 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | House Calendar Number 116 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |