House | 07/12/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/28/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/28/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/25/2019 | Public Act 19-172 | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 515 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | File Number 203 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | House Calendar Number 153 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |