House
|
06/26/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2019
|
Public Act 19-52
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 612
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
File Number 496
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
House Calendar Number 323
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|