Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07291 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/13/2019

                             
 
 
Substitute House Bill No. 7291 
 
Public Act No. 19-52 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING SC HOOL SECURITY. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 10-222n of the general statutes is repealed and the 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 
(a) Not later than January 1, 2014, the Department of Emergency 
Services and Public Protection, in consultation with the Department of 
Education, shall develop school security and safety plan standards. 
Not later than January 1, 2020, and every three years thereafter, the 
Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, in 
consultation with the Department of Education, shall reevaluate and 
update the school security and safety plan standards. The school 
security and safety plan standards shall be an all-hazards approach to 
emergencies at public schools and shall include, but not be limited to, 
(1) involvement of local officials, including the chief executive officer 
of the municipality, the superintendent of schools, law enforcement, 
fire, public health, emergency management and emergency medical 
services, in the development of school security and safety plans, (2) a 
command center organization structure based on the federal National 
Incident Management System and a description of the responsibilities 
of such command center organization, (3) a requirement that a school 
security and safety committee be established at each school, in  Substitute House Bill No. 7291 
 
Public Act No. 19-52 	2 of 4 
 
accordance with the provisions of section 10-222m, (4) crisis 
management procedures, (5) a requirement that local law enforcement 
and other local public safety officials evaluate, score and provide 
feedback on fire drills and crisis response drills, conducted pursuant to 
section 10-231, (6) a requirement that local and regional boards of 
education annually submit reports to the Department of Emergency 
Services and Public Protection regarding such fire drills and crisis 
response drills, (7) procedures for managing various types of 
emergencies, (8) a requirement that each local and regional board of 
education conduct a security and vulnerability assessment for each 
school under the jurisdiction of such board every two years and 
develop a school security and safety plan for each such school, in 
accordance with the provisions of section 10-222m, based on the results 
of such assessment, (9) a requirement that the safe school climate 
committee for each school, established pursuant to section 10-222k, 
collect and evaluate information relating to instances of disturbing or 
threatening behavior that may not meet the definition of bullying, as 
defined in section 10-222d, and report such information, as necessary, 
to the district safe school climate coordinator, described in section 10-
222k, and the school security and safety committee for the school, 
established pursuant to section 10-222m, and (10) a requirement that 
the school security and safety plan for each school provide an 
orientation on such school security and safety plan to each school 
employee, as defined in section 10-222d, at such school and provide 
violence prevention training in a manner prescribed in such school 
security and safety plan. The Department of Emergency Services and 
Public Protection shall make such standards available to local officials, 
including local and regional boards of education, and the Department 
of Education shall distribute such standards to all public schools 
within the state. 
(b) Not later than January 1, 2014, and annually thereafter, the 
Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection shall submit  Substitute House Bill No. 7291 
 
Public Act No. 19-52 	3 of 4 
 
the school security and safety plan standards and any 
recommendations for legislation regarding such standards to the joint 
standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of 
matters relating to public safety and education, in accordance with the 
provisions of section 11-4a.  
Sec. 2. (Effective from passage) (a) The Department of Emergency 
Services and Public Protection shall evaluate and seek methods to 
simplify the documentation required from local and regional boards of 
education to comply with the reporting requirements of section 10-
222m of the general statutes and subdivision (6) of subsection (a) of 
section 10-222n of the general statutes, as amended by this act. Not 
later than January 1, 2020, the department shall submit a report, in 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 
to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 
cognizance of matters relating to public safety, identifying the essential 
components and documentation required for such reports and 
indicating how the department will simplify the required 
documentation. The department shall implement new requirements 
for documentation for reports, pursuant to the department's findings, 
not later than July 1, 2020. 
(b) The Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection 
and the School Safety Infrastructure Council, established under section 
10-292r of the general statutes, shall evaluate and seek methods to 
simplify the documentation required of applicants for the school 
security infrastructure competitive grant program. Not later than 
January 1, 2020, the department and council shall submit a report, in 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 
to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 
cognizance of matters relating to public safety, identifying the essential 
components and documentation required for such applications and 
indicating how the department will simplify the required  Substitute House Bill No. 7291 
 
Public Act No. 19-52 	4 of 4 
 
documentation. The department and council shall implement new 
requirements for documentation for applications, pursuant to the 
department's and council's findings, not later than July 1, 2020. 
Sec. 3. Section 29-452 of the general statutes is repealed and the 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 
The Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection shall 
develop criteria to identify qualified school security consultants 
operating in this state. The department shall establish and maintain a 
registry of [school security consultants operating in the state] such 
consultants. The registry shall contain the names and employers of 
qualified school security consultants and such other information as the 
Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection may 
require. Such registry shall be updated at least annually by the 
department, be made available to the public upon request and be 
published on the department's Internet web site.