House | 04/08/2019 | File Number 497 | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | House Calendar Number 324 | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |