House | 04/15/2019 | File Number 654 | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | House Calendar Number 399 | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |