House | 05/28/2019 | File Number 1009 | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 613 | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9486 | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | File Number 620 | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | House Calendar Number 374 | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |