House | 04/03/2019 | File Number 358 | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | House Calendar Number 236 | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |