House | 04/10/2019 | File Number 584 | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | House Calendar Number 357 | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |