House | 05/30/2019 | File Number 1017 | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 636 | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9545 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | File Number 707 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | House Calendar Number 443 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Public Hearing 04/01 | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |