House | 05/16/2019 | File Number 895 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Calendar Number 601 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Public Hearing 04/05 | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |