1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | LCO No. 6535 1 of 4 |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | General Assembly Raised Bill No. 7409 |
---|
6 | 6 | | January Session, 2019 |
---|
7 | 7 | | LCO No. 6535 |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND |
---|
11 | 11 | | BONDING |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | Introduced by: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (FIN) |
---|
16 | 16 | | |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | AN ACT CONCERNING TH E ADMISSIONS TAX. |
---|
21 | 21 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
22 | 22 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | Section 1. Section 12-541 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 |
---|
25 | 25 | | following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2019, and 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | applicable to sales made on or after July 1, 2019): 3 |
---|
27 | 27 | | (a) [There] Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, there 4 |
---|
28 | 28 | | is hereby imposed a tax of ten per cent of the admission charge to any 5 |
---|
29 | 29 | | place of amusement, entertainment or recreation. [, except that no] No 6 |
---|
30 | 30 | | tax shall be imposed with respect to any admission charge: 7 |
---|
31 | 31 | | (1) [when] When the admission charge is less than one dollar or, in 8 |
---|
32 | 32 | | the case of any motion picture show, when the admission charge is not 9 |
---|
33 | 33 | | more than five dollars; [,] 10 |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2) [when] When a daily admission charge is imposed [which] that 11 |
---|
35 | 35 | | entitles the patron to participate in an athletic or sporting activity; [,] 12 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (3) [to] To any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, 13 |
---|
37 | 37 | | Raised Bill No. 7409 |
---|
38 | 38 | | |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | LCO No. 6535 2 of 4 |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | as defined in section 32-651, if all of the proceeds from the event inure 14 |
---|
44 | 44 | | exclusively to an entity [which] that is exempt from federal income tax 15 |
---|
45 | 45 | | under the Internal Revenue Code, provided such entity actively 16 |
---|
46 | 46 | | engages in and assumes the financial risk associated with the 17 |
---|
47 | 47 | | presentation of such event; [,] 18 |
---|
48 | 48 | | (4) [to] To any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, 19 |
---|
49 | 49 | | as defined in section 32-651, [which] that, in the opinion of the 20 |
---|
50 | 50 | | commissioner, is conducted primarily to raise funds for an entity 21 |
---|
51 | 51 | | [which] that is exempt from federal income tax under the Internal 22 |
---|
52 | 52 | | Revenue Code, provided the commissioner is satisfied that the net 23 |
---|
53 | 53 | | profit [which] that inures to such entity from such event will exceed 24 |
---|
54 | 54 | | the amount of the admissions tax [which] that, but for this subdivision, 25 |
---|
55 | 55 | | would be imposed upon the person making such charge to such event; 26 |
---|
56 | 56 | | [,] 27 |
---|
57 | 57 | | (5) [other] Other than for events held at the stadium facility, as 28 |
---|
58 | 58 | | defined in section 32-651, paid by centers of service for elderly persons, 29 |
---|
59 | 59 | | as described in section 17a-310; [,] 30 |
---|
60 | 60 | | (6) [to] To any production featuring live performances by actors or 31 |
---|
61 | 61 | | musicians presented at Gateway's Candlewood Playhouse, Ocean 32 |
---|
62 | 62 | | Beach Park or any nonprofit theater or playhouse in the state, provided 33 |
---|
63 | 63 | | such theater or playhouse possesses evidence confirming exemption 34 |
---|
64 | 64 | | from federal tax under Section 501 of the Internal Revenue Code; [,] 35 |
---|
65 | 65 | | (7) [to] To any carnival or amusement ride; [,] 36 |
---|
66 | 66 | | (8) [to] To any interscholastic athletic event held at the stadium 37 |
---|
67 | 67 | | facility, as defined in section 32-651; [,] or 38 |
---|
68 | 68 | | (9) [if] If the admission charge would have been subject to tax under 39 |
---|
69 | 69 | | the provisions of section 12-542 of the general statutes, revision of 40 |
---|
70 | 70 | | 1958, revised to January 1, 1999. 41 |
---|
71 | 71 | | (b) (1) For the following venues and events, for sales occurring on or 42 |
---|
72 | 72 | | Raised Bill No. 7409 |
---|
73 | 73 | | |
---|
74 | 74 | | |
---|
75 | 75 | | |
---|
76 | 76 | | LCO No. 6535 3 of 4 |
---|
77 | 77 | | |
---|
78 | 78 | | after July 1, 2019, but prior to July 1, 2020, the tax imposed under this 43 |
---|
79 | 79 | | section shall be seven and one-half per cent of the admission charge to: 44 |
---|
80 | 80 | | (A) Any event at the XL Center in Hartford; 45 |
---|
81 | 81 | | (B) Any event at the Dunkin' Donuts Park in Hartford; 46 |
---|
82 | 82 | | (C) Any athletic event presented by a member team of the Atlantic 47 |
---|
83 | 83 | | League of Professional Baseball at the New Britain Stadium; 48 |
---|
84 | 84 | | (D) Any event at the Webster Bank Arena in Bridgeport; 49 |
---|
85 | 85 | | (E) Any event at the Oakdale Theatre in Wallingford; and 50 |
---|
86 | 86 | | (F) Any event other than an interscholastic athletic event at the 51 |
---|
87 | 87 | | stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651. 52 |
---|
88 | 88 | | (2) For the venues and events specified in subdivision (1) of this 53 |
---|
89 | 89 | | subsection, for sales occurring on or after July 1, 2020, the tax imposed 54 |
---|
90 | 90 | | under this section shall be five per cent of the admission charge. 55 |
---|
91 | 91 | | (3) On and after [July 1, 2000, the tax imposed under this section on 56 |
---|
92 | 92 | | any motion picture show shall be eight per cent of the admission 57 |
---|
93 | 93 | | charge and, on and after] July 1, 2001, the tax imposed under this 58 |
---|
94 | 94 | | section on any [such] motion picture show shall be six per cent of 59 |
---|
95 | 95 | | [such] the admission charge. 60 |
---|
96 | 96 | | [(b)] (c) The tax shall be imposed upon the person making such 61 |
---|
97 | 97 | | charge and reimbursement for the tax shall be collected by such person 62 |
---|
98 | 98 | | from the purchase. Such reimbursement, termed "tax", shall be paid by 63 |
---|
99 | 99 | | the purchaser to the person making the admission charge. Such tax, 64 |
---|
100 | 100 | | when added to the admission charge, shall be a debt from the 65 |
---|
101 | 101 | | purchaser to the person making the admission charge and shall be 66 |
---|
102 | 102 | | recoverable at law. The amount of tax reimbursement, when so 67 |
---|
103 | 103 | | collected, shall be deemed to be a special fund in trust for the state of 68 |
---|
104 | 104 | | Connecticut. 69 |
---|
105 | 105 | | Raised Bill No. 7409 |
---|
106 | 106 | | |
---|
107 | 107 | | |
---|
108 | 108 | | |
---|
109 | 109 | | LCO No. 6535 4 of 4 |
---|
110 | 110 | | |
---|
111 | 111 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
112 | 112 | | sections: |
---|
113 | 113 | | |
---|
114 | 114 | | Section 1 July 1, 2019, and |
---|
115 | 115 | | applicable to sales made on |
---|
116 | 116 | | or after July 1, 2019 |
---|
117 | 117 | | 12-541 |
---|
118 | 118 | | |
---|
119 | 119 | | Statement of Purpose: |
---|
120 | 120 | | To reduce the rate of the admissions tax for certain venues and events. |
---|
121 | 121 | | |
---|
122 | 122 | | [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, |
---|
123 | 123 | | except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is |
---|
124 | 124 | | not underlined.] |
---|
125 | 125 | | |
---|