LCO No. 6535 1 of 4 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 7409 January Session, 2019 LCO No. 6535 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING Introduced by: (FIN) AN ACT CONCERNING TH E ADMISSIONS TAX. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Section 12-541 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2019, and 2 applicable to sales made on or after July 1, 2019): 3 (a) [There] Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, there 4 is hereby imposed a tax of ten per cent of the admission charge to any 5 place of amusement, entertainment or recreation. [, except that no] No 6 tax shall be imposed with respect to any admission charge: 7 (1) [when] When the admission charge is less than one dollar or, in 8 the case of any motion picture show, when the admission charge is not 9 more than five dollars; [,] 10 (2) [when] When a daily admission charge is imposed [which] that 11 entitles the patron to participate in an athletic or sporting activity; [,] 12 (3) [to] To any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, 13 Raised Bill No. 7409 LCO No. 6535 2 of 4 as defined in section 32-651, if all of the proceeds from the event inure 14 exclusively to an entity [which] that is exempt from federal income tax 15 under the Internal Revenue Code, provided such entity actively 16 engages in and assumes the financial risk associated with the 17 presentation of such event; [,] 18 (4) [to] To any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, 19 as defined in section 32-651, [which] that, in the opinion of the 20 commissioner, is conducted primarily to raise funds for an entity 21 [which] that is exempt from federal income tax under the Internal 22 Revenue Code, provided the commissioner is satisfied that the net 23 profit [which] that inures to such entity from such event will exceed 24 the amount of the admissions tax [which] that, but for this subdivision, 25 would be imposed upon the person making such charge to such event; 26 [,] 27 (5) [other] Other than for events held at the stadium facility, as 28 defined in section 32-651, paid by centers of service for elderly persons, 29 as described in section 17a-310; [,] 30 (6) [to] To any production featuring live performances by actors or 31 musicians presented at Gateway's Candlewood Playhouse, Ocean 32 Beach Park or any nonprofit theater or playhouse in the state, provided 33 such theater or playhouse possesses evidence confirming exemption 34 from federal tax under Section 501 of the Internal Revenue Code; [,] 35 (7) [to] To any carnival or amusement ride; [,] 36 (8) [to] To any interscholastic athletic event held at the stadium 37 facility, as defined in section 32-651; [,] or 38 (9) [if] If the admission charge would have been subject to tax under 39 the provisions of section 12-542 of the general statutes, revision of 40 1958, revised to January 1, 1999. 41 (b) (1) For the following venues and events, for sales occurring on or 42 Raised Bill No. 7409 LCO No. 6535 3 of 4 after July 1, 2019, but prior to July 1, 2020, the tax imposed under this 43 section shall be seven and one-half per cent of the admission charge to: 44 (A) Any event at the XL Center in Hartford; 45 (B) Any event at the Dunkin' Donuts Park in Hartford; 46 (C) Any athletic event presented by a member team of the Atlantic 47 League of Professional Baseball at the New Britain Stadium; 48 (D) Any event at the Webster Bank Arena in Bridgeport; 49 (E) Any event at the Oakdale Theatre in Wallingford; and 50 (F) Any event other than an interscholastic athletic event at the 51 stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651. 52 (2) For the venues and events specified in subdivision (1) of this 53 subsection, for sales occurring on or after July 1, 2020, the tax imposed 54 under this section shall be five per cent of the admission charge. 55 (3) On and after [July 1, 2000, the tax imposed under this section on 56 any motion picture show shall be eight per cent of the admission 57 charge and, on and after] July 1, 2001, the tax imposed under this 58 section on any [such] motion picture show shall be six per cent of 59 [such] the admission charge. 60 [(b)] (c) The tax shall be imposed upon the person making such 61 charge and reimbursement for the tax shall be collected by such person 62 from the purchase. Such reimbursement, termed "tax", shall be paid by 63 the purchaser to the person making the admission charge. Such tax, 64 when added to the admission charge, shall be a debt from the 65 purchaser to the person making the admission charge and shall be 66 recoverable at law. The amount of tax reimbursement, when so 67 collected, shall be deemed to be a special fund in trust for the state of 68 Connecticut. 69 Raised Bill No. 7409 LCO No. 6535 4 of 4 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2019, and applicable to sales made on or after July 1, 2019 12-541 Statement of Purpose: To reduce the rate of the admissions tax for certain venues and events. [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]