House | 06/05/2019 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Adopted, Senate | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 381 | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | File Number 206 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | House Calendar Number 156 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/05/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |