House | 05/22/2019 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | File Number 974 | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | House Calendar Number 630 | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/28/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/17/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/17/2019 | House Favorable | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Public Hearing 05/17 | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Filed with House Clerks 05/03 |