Senate | 05/13/2019 | House Calendar Number 572 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8459 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | File Number 43 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 44 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/18/2019 | Vote to Draft |