Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
File Number 438
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 207
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2019
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2019
|
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2019
|
Change of Reference General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|