Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2019
Bill May 1, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019
Bill March 19, 2019