Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
House Calendar Number 573
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
File Number 710
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 327
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2019
|
Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|