Senate | 06/26/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/14/2019 | Public Act 19-69 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | House Calendar Number 607 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | File Number 511 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 250 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |