4 | 4 | | SB.docx |
---|
5 | 5 | | 1 of 2 |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 360 |
---|
8 | 8 | | January Session, 2019 |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | AN ACT CONCERNING TH E PROCESSING OF WORK OPPORTUNITY |
---|
15 | 15 | | TAX CREDIT APPLICATIONS. |
---|
16 | 16 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
17 | 17 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) The Labor Department 1 |
---|
20 | 20 | | shall: (1) Process forty per cent of all Work Opportunity Tax Credits 2 |
---|
21 | 21 | | submitted and in its possession not later than July 1, 2020, (2) process 3 |
---|
22 | 22 | | sixty per cent of all Work Opportunity Tax Credits submitted and in its 4 |
---|
23 | 23 | | possession not later than July 1, 2021, (3) process eighty per cent of all 5 |
---|
24 | 24 | | Work Opportunity Tax Credits submitted and in its possession not 6 |
---|
25 | 25 | | later than July 1, 2022, and (4) process one hundred per cent of all 7 |
---|
26 | 26 | | Work Opportunity Tax Credits submitted and in its possession not 8 |
---|
27 | 27 | | later than July 1, 2023. 9 |
---|
28 | 28 | | (b) Not later than July 1, 2020, the Labor Department shall pursue a 10 |
---|
29 | 29 | | method to receive and process all applications for Work Opportunity 11 |
---|
30 | 30 | | Tax Credits electronically. Such method shall include the ability to 12 |
---|
31 | 31 | | receive or access information electronically held by other relevant state 13 |
---|
32 | 32 | | agencies. 14 |
---|
33 | 33 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
34 | 34 | | sections: |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | Section 1 July 1, 2019 New section Substitute Bill No. 360 |
---|
37 | 37 | | |
---|
38 | 38 | | |
---|
39 | 39 | | LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00360- |
---|