Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00360 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/05/2019

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00360-R03-
SB.docx  
1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 360  
January Session, 2019 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E PROCESSING OF WORK OPPORTUNITY 
TAX CREDIT APPLICATIONS.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) The Labor Department 1 
shall: (1) Process forty per cent of all Work Opportunity Tax Credits 2 
submitted and in its possession not later than July 1, 2020, (2) process 3 
sixty per cent of all Work Opportunity Tax Credits submitted and in its 4 
possession not later than July 1, 2021, (3) process eighty per cent of all 5 
Work Opportunity Tax Credits submitted and in its possession not 6 
later than July 1, 2022, and (4) process one hundred per cent of all 7 
Work Opportunity Tax Credits submitted and in its possession not 8 
later than July 1, 2023. 9 
(b) Not later than July 1, 2020, the Labor Department shall pursue a 10 
method to receive and process all applications for Work Opportunity 11 
Tax Credits electronically. Such method shall include the ability to 12 
receive or access information electronically held by other relevant state 13 
agencies. 14 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 New section  Substitute Bill No. 360 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00360-
R03-SB.docx }   
2 of 2 
 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
In subsections (a) and (b), "Department of Labor" was changed to 
"Labor Department," for accuracy. 
 
LAB Joint Favorable Subst. -LCO