Senate | 05/15/2019 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | File Number 657 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 316 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |