Senate | 04/22/2019 | No Action | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | File Number 589 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 297 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |