Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
House Calendar Number 689
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10218
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
File Number 658
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 317
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|