Senate | 03/25/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference General Law | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |