Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00419 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/22/2019

                             
 
LCO 5946  \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00419-R02-
SB.docx  
1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Committee Bill No.  419  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 5946 
 
 
Referred to Committee on TRANSPORTATION  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(TRA)  
 
 
 
AN ACT PROHIBITING GASOLINE ZONE PRICING.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 16a-23 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 2 
(a) No person engaged in the business of refining petroleum into 3 
gasoline and furnishing gasoline to retail distributors of gasoline for 4 
sale to the public in this state shall fail to furnish gasoline to 5 
independent retail distributors of gasoline in this state, whether or not 6 
franchised by such person, at wholesale prices in reasonable quantities 7 
as long as [he] such person continues to furnish gasoline to retail 8 
distributors of gasoline in this state which are wholly owned by [him] 9 
such person or operated under a franchise granted by [him] such 10 
person. 11 
(b) It shall constitute, prima facie, a violation of the provisions of 12 
subsection (a) of this section for any such person (1) during any 13 
calendar month beginning after July 1, 1973, to deliver to independent 14 
retail distributors of gasoline in this state a percentage of the total 15 
gallons of gasoline delivered by [him] such person to all retail 16  Committee Bill No. 419 
 
 
LCO 5946  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00419-
R02-SB.docx }   
2 of 3 
 
distributors of gasoline in this state during that month which is lower 17 
than the percentage of the total gallons of gasoline delivered by [him] 18 
such person to all retail distributors of gasoline in this state during the 19 
period from July 1, 1971, to June 30, 1972, which was delivered by 20 
[him] such person to independent retail distributors of gasoline in this 21 
state during that period, or (2) to sell gasoline to independent retail 22 
distributors of gasoline in this state at a price during any such month 23 
which is greater than (A) the average price at which [he] such person 24 
sold gasoline to such distributors during the period from July 1, 1971, 25 
to June 30, 1972, increased by (B) a percentage equal to the percentage 26 
by which the average price for gasoline sold during that month to 27 
retail distributors of gasoline which are wholly owned by, or operated 28 
under a franchise granted by, that person exceeds the average price for 29 
gasoline sold to such distributors during the period from July 1, 1971, 30 
to June 30, 1972. 31 
(c) No producer or refiner of petroleum products who is subject to 32 
the provisions of section 14-344a and furnishes gasoline to retail 33 
distributors of gasoline for sale to the public in this state shall use a 34 
pricing system under which the wholesale price paid for such gasoline 35 
by such retail distributor is determined based on the geographic 36 
location of such retail distributor in this state, or any other system that 37 
would prevent retail distributors of gasoline from paying lower prices 38 
on an equal basis with other retail distributors of gasoline in this state. 39 
Any such producer or refiner shall not discriminate in the price of such 40 
gasoline charged to retail distributors of gasoline in this state, except to 41 
offer discounts or rebates that may be determined by such producer or 42 
refiner from time to time. Such discounts or rebates shall be disclosed 43 
by such producer or refiner to the retail distributors and shall be 44 
offered by such producer or refiner to all of its retail distributors on 45 
equal terms and conditions. When offered, all such discounts or 46 
rebates and the time period they are offered shall be listed as a 47 
separate line item entry on each invoice of the producer or refiner. 48 
[(c)] (d) A violation of the provisions of subsection (a) or (c) of this 49  Committee Bill No. 419 
 
 
LCO 5946  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00419-
R02-SB.docx }   
3 of 3 
 
section constitutes an unfair trade practice within the provisions of 50 
chapter 735a.  51 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2019 16a-23 
 
TRA Joint Favorable C/R 	GL