House | 06/05/2019 | House Calendar Number 724 | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | File Number 442 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 226 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |