Senate | 04/11/2019 | File Number 634 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 311 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |