Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00527 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2019

Chaptered

Bill June 19, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019
Bill March 22, 2019