Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00527 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/19/2019

                             
 
 
Senate Bill No. 527 
 
Public Act No. 19-81 
 
 
AN ACT PERMITTING MU NICIPALITIES TO COMB INE THE 
PROPERTY ASSESSMENTS OF MULTIPLE ELECTRIC 
GENERATING FACILITIES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 32-71a of the general statutes is repealed and the 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage, and 
applicable to assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2018): 
(a) Any electric generating facility, the construction of which is 
completed after July 1, 1998, may be treated for the purposes of section 
32-71 as if it were located in an enterprise zone and used for 
commercial or retail purposes. Notwithstanding the provisions of 
section 32-71, upon the approval of a municipality's legislative body, 
either before or after July 1, 2001, the full amount of either assessments 
or taxes may be fixed for the real and personal property of such electric 
generating facility both during and after the construction period, 
provided such assessments or taxes as so fixed represent an 
approximation of the projected tax liability of such facility based on a 
reasonable estimation of its fair market value as determined by the 
municipality upon the exercise of its best efforts. 
(b) Any new electric generating facility, the construction of which is  Senate Bill No. 527 
 
Public Act No. 19-81 	2 of 3 
 
completed after July 1, 2003, may be treated for the purposes of section 
32-71 as if it were located in an enterprise zone and used for 
commercial or retail purposes, provided: (1) The owner of such facility 
has negotiated a tax agreement with the municipality in which such 
facility would be located; and (2) such agreement has been approved 
by the municipality's legislative body between January 1, 2002, and 
February 28, 2002. Notwithstanding the provisions of section 32-71, 
upon approval of such municipality's legislative body, either before or 
after June 14, 2002, up to the full amount of either assessments or taxes 
may be fixed for the real and personal property of such electric 
generating facility both during and after the construction period, 
provided such assessments or taxes as so fixed represent an 
approximation of the commensurate portion of the projected tax 
liability of such facility based on a reasonable estimation of its fair 
market value as determined by the municipality upon the exercise of 
its best efforts. 
(c) Any new electric generating facility, the construction of which is 
completed after July 1, 2003, may be treated for the purposes of section 
32-71 as if it were located in an enterprise zone and used for 
commercial or retail purposes, provided the municipality in which 
such facility is located is under state governance. Notwithstanding the 
provisions of section 32-71, upon approval of such municipality's 
legislative body, either before or after June 14, 2002, up to the full 
amount of either assessments or taxes may be fixed for the real and 
personal property of such electric generating facility both during and 
after the construction period, provided such assessments or taxes as so 
fixed represent an approximation of the commensurate portion of the 
projected tax liability of such facility based on a reasonable estimation 
of its fair market value as determined by the municipality upon the 
exercise of its best efforts. 
(d) Any existing electric generating facility, the construction of  Senate Bill No. 527 
 
Public Act No. 19-81 	3 of 3 
 
which is completed before July 1, 1998, and any new electric 
generating facility, the construction of which is completed after July 1, 
2019, which new electric generating facility is constructed at the same 
location as such existing electric generating facility, may be treated 
collectively as one combined electric generating facility for the 
purposes of section 32-71 as if such combined electric generating 
facility were located in an enterprise zone and used for commercial or 
retail purposes. Notwithstanding the provisions of section 32-71, upon 
the approval, either before or after July 1, 2019, of the legislative body 
of the municipality in which such combined electric generating facility 
is located, the full amount of either assessments or taxes may be fixed 
for the real and personal property of both such existing and new 
electric generating facilities before, during and after the construction 
period of such new electric generating facility, provided such 
assessments or taxes as so fixed represent an approximation of the 
projected tax liability of such combined electric generating facility 
based on a reasonable estimation of its fair market value as determined 
by the municipality upon the exercise of its best efforts. 
[(d)] (e) As used in this section, "electric generating facility" means a 
facility, as defined in subdivision (3) of subsection (a) of section 16-50i.