Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
House Calendar Number 555
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
File Number 444
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 220
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2019
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2019
|
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2019
|
Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|