Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Public Act 19-111
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
House Calendar Number 574
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7552
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
File Number 717
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 349
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|