Senate | 04/17/2019 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | File Number 36 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 37 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/05/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |