Senate | 06/01/2019 | House Calendar Number 691 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8000 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | File Number 659 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 318 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/11/2019 | Vote to Draft |