Senate
|
06/21/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
Special Act 19-13
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
House Calendar Number 553
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7542
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
File Number 315
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 156
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/14
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|