Senate | 04/03/2019 | File Number 366 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 190 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |