Senate | 05/30/2019 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule B 7759 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7808 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | File Number 447 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 222 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |