Senate | 06/21/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | Public Act 19-30 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | House Calendar Number 577 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | File Number 515 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 259 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |