LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2019 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00717
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00717
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2019 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00717
Action History
Senate
03/27/2019
Motion Failed (JF)
Senate
03/18/2019
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
Senate
03/15/2019
Drafted by Committee
Senate
03/08/2019
Vote to Draft
Senate
02/21/2019
Public Hearing 02/25
Senate
02/07/2019
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing