Senate | 04/04/2019 | File Number 448 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 225 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |