Senate | 04/17/2019 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | File Number 128 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 79 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/01/2019 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |