Senate | 05/30/2019 | House Calendar Number 675 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | File Number 131 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 82 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |