Senate | 03/12/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/11/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |