Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Public Act 19-115
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
House Calendar Number 504
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7372
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
File Number 41
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 40
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|