Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00852 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/11/2019

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00852-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 852  
January Session, 2019 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E ESTABLISHING OF A PERSONAL 
FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT PILOT PROGRAM.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective from passage) For the fiscal years ending June 30, 1 
2020, and June 30, 2021, there is established a personal financial 2 
management pilot program to be administered by the Capitol Region 3 
Education Council. The council shall assist member school districts in 4 
the provision of personal financial management instruction using the 5 
curriculum materials made available by the State Board of Education, 6 
pursuant to subsection (d) of section 10-16b of the general statutes, 7 
during the school year commencing July 1, 2020. Such assistance by the 8 
council may include, but need not be limited to, the collection and 9 
dissemination of curriculum materials, as developed in the plan 10 
provided under section 10-16pp of the general statutes, and the use of 11 
advisors who have expertise in personal financial management and 12 
who can provide assistance to teachers in such personal financial 13 
management instruction in classrooms. For purposes of this section, 14 
"member school districts" means those local and regional boards of 15 
education that are members of the Capitol Region Education Council. 16 
Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2019) The sum of one hundred thousand 17 
dollars is appropriated to the Department of Education, from the 18 
General Fund, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020, for the Capitol 19  Substitute Bill No. 852 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00852-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 2 
 
Region Education Council to prepare for the administration of the 20 
personal financial management pilot program, established pursuant to 21 
section 1 of this act. 22 
Sec. 3. (Effective July 1, 2020) The sum of one hundred thousand 23 
dollars is appropriated to the Department of Education, from the 24 
General Fund, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2021, for the Capitol 25 
Region Education Council to administer the personal financial 26 
management pilot program, established pursuant to section 1 of this 27 
act. 28 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2019 New section 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2020 New section 
 
ED Joint Favorable Subst. C/R 	APP