Senate | 05/24/2019 | House Calendar Number 660 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | File Number 78 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 65 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |