Senate | 04/03/2019 | File Number 370 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 180 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |